Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria Filia

Deceased

Bishop of Alghero


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1808BornBolotana
13 Jun 183526.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 187162.9AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
4 Feb 187263.1Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
22 Oct 188273.8DiedBishop of Alghero, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Filia:
Bishop Giovanni Maria Filia (born , died ) Bishop of Alghero

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013