Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serafino Corrias

Deceased

Bishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1823BornCasa Nuovi Canali
19 Oct 184522.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 187148.8AppointedBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy
18 Feb 187249.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy
31 May 189673.3DiedBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy

MicroData Summary for Serafino Corrias:
Bishop Serafino Corrias (born , died ) Bishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri)

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013