Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Piña Batllevell, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Puerto Iguazú


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1930BornSabadell, Spain
10 Dec 196131.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
16 Jun 198656.0AppointedBishop of Puerto Iguazú, Argentina
16 Aug 198656.2Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Iguazú, Argentina
3 Oct 200676.3RetiredBishop of Puerto Iguazú, Argentina
8 Jul 201383.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Puerto Iguazú, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Piña Batllevell:
Bishop Joaquín Piña Batllevell S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Puerto Iguazú

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Oct 2006
  • d: CB, 8 Jul 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015