Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Didier Pérouse de Montclos, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sikasso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1910BornAmiens, France
29 Jun 193626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
17 Oct 194737.5AppointedPrefect of Sikasoo, Mali
6 Jul 196353.2AppointedBishop of Sikasso, Mali
20 Oct 196353.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sikasso, Mali
8 Jul 197666.2ResignedBishop of Sikasso, Mali
19 Dec 198070.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Sikasso, Mali

MicroData Summary for Didier Pérouse de Montclos:
Bishop Didier Pérouse de Montclos M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sikasso

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013