Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Mauro Pereira Bastos, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1955Born
198125.3Solemn ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
7 Jul 198428.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
5 Jul 200044.8AppointedBishop of Janaúba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
17 Sep 200045.0Ordained BishopBishop of Janaúba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
19 Apr 200650.6AppointedBishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
18 Jun 200650.8InstalledBishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
14 Sep 200651.0DiedBishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Mauro Pereira Bastos:
Bishop José Mauro Pereira Bastos C.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Guaxupé

  • a priest for 22.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2006
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,840
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013