Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bruno Pedron, S.D.B.

Bishop of Ji-Paraná, Rondonia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1944 Born
16 Aug 196319.2ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
6 Apr 197429.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Mar 199954.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Jardim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
21 May 199954.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Jardim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
4 Aug 199955.1SucceededBishop of Jardim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
11 Apr 200762.8AppointedBishop of Ji-Paraná, Rondonia, Brazil
24 Jun 200763.0InstalledBishop of Ji-Paraná, Rondonia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Bruno Pedron
Bishop Bruno Pedron S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Ji-Paraná

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorreglia, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ji-Paraná.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Apr 2007
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,558

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018