Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabrizio Paolucci

Deceased

Bishop of Città della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565¹Born
3 Aug 160540.5AppointedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
14 Aug 160540.6Ordained BishopBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
30 Jan 162560.0DiedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Paolucci
Bishop Fabrizio Paolucci (born 1565, died ) Bishop of Città della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForli
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Vallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: SM, 13 Nov 2009
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 152
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 10
  • ob: AT, 12 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast