Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Alferio Ossorio

Deceased

Bishop of Fondi (Fundi)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1634¹BornL’Aquila
1 Apr 166935.2AppointedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
7 Apr 166935.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
24 Feb 169359.1DiedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Alferio Ossorio:
Bishop Filippo Alferio Ossorio (died ) Bishop of Fondi (Fundi)

  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 207
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 192
  • c34: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 8 Apr 2015