Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo Oropesa Lorente

Bishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1950 Born
15 Jul 198433.7Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
9 Jul 200756.7AppointedBishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba
15 Sep 200756.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Domingo Oropesa Lorente
Bishop Domingo Oropesa Lorente (born ) Bishop of Cienfuegos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcazar de San Juan, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cienfuegos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,511
  • name: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast