Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Baptist Orbin

Deceased

Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1806Born
6 Aug 183023.8Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
2 May 188275.6SelectedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
12 May 188275.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
12 Jul 188275.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
8 Apr 188679.5DiedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist Orbin (VIAF: 170904025)
Archbishop Johann Baptist Orbin (born , died ) Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruchsal
Ordained BishopFreiburg im Breisgau, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 276
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017