Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Joseph Hefele

Deceased

Bishop of Rottenburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1809Born
14 Aug 183324.4Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
17 Jun 186960.2SelectedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
22 Nov 186960.6ConfirmedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
29 Dec 186960.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
5 Jun 189384.2DiedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Joseph Hefele (VIAF: 7425873)
Bishop Karl Joseph Hefele (born , died ) Bishop of Rottenburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHochmühle
Ordained BishopCathedral, Rottenburg, Diocese of Rottenburg

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 487
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,650
  • ob/c2+: ATh
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017