Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Afonso de Oliveira Lima, S.D.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Brejo, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1916Born
8 Dec 194024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
29 Nov 197155.2AppointedBishop of Brejo, Maranhão, Brazil
9 Apr 197255.6Ordained BishopBishop of Brejo, Maranhão, Brazil
25 Sep 199175.0RetiredBishop of Brejo, Maranhão, Brazil
31 Aug 199478.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Brejo, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Afonso de Oliveira Lima
Bishop Afonso de Oliveira Lima S.D.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Brejo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimoeiro do Norte
Ordained BishopCathedral, Brejo, Diocese of Brejo, Maranhão

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast