Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nereo Page Odchimar

Bishop of Tandag


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1940 BornBacuad
19 Dec 196424.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Oct 200161.0AppointedBishop of Tandag, Philippines
27 Nov 200161.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tandag, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Nereo Page Odchimar:
Bishop Nereo Page Odchimar (born ) Bishop of Tandag

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tandag.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,078
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • mn: CB, 25 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 25 Jul 2015