Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Nguyên Văn Kham

Bishop of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1952 Born
30 Aug 198027.9Ordained PriestPriest of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
15 Oct 200856.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
15 Oct 200856.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Trofimiana
15 Nov 200856.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trofimiana
26 Jul 201461.8AppointedBishop of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam
30 Aug 201461.9InstalledBishop of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pierre Nguyên Văn Kham
Bishop Pierre Nguyên Văn Kham (born ) Bishop of Mỹ Tho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHa Dong

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mỹ Tho.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,985
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2014
  • i: CB, 20 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast