Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Nguyên Anh Tuan

Auxiliary Bishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Catrum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1960 Born
30 Jun 199939.2Ordained PriestPriest of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
25 Aug 201757.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
25 Aug 201757.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Catrum
14 Oct 201757.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Catrum

MicroData Summary for Louis Nguyên Anh Tuan
Bishop Louis Nguyên Anh Tuan (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuang Nam, Vicariate Apostolic of Saigon
Ordained BishopCourtyard, St. Joseph's, Seminary, Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh, Archdiocese of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Aug 2017
  • ob: CB, 7 Sep 2017
  • c2+: CB, 14 Oct 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,596

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast