Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolo Navoni

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1755Born
21 Jul 180045.4SelectedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
11 Aug 180045.5ConfirmedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
16 Nov 180045.7Ordained BishopBishop of Iglesias, Italy
27 Feb 181964.0SelectedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
29 Mar 181964.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
22 Jul 183681.4DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicolo Navoni
Archbishop Nicolo Navoni (born , died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeapola del Marina

  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 18
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 126, and Page 183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018