Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Pes, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1756¹BornTempio
5 Aug 178125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
27 Feb 181963.2SelectedBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy
29 Mar 181963.2ConfirmedBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy
12 Sep 181963.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy
8 Dec 183175.9DiedBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Pes:
Bishop Domenico Pes Sch. P. (died ) Bishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri)

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1822
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 111
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,390

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013