Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diego Gregorio Cardinal Cadello

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1735BornCagliari
24 Sep 175722.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Cagliari, Italy
20 May 175823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cagliari, Italy
10 Jan 179862.8SelectedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
29 Jan 179862.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
27 May 179863.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
17 Jan 180367.8Elevated to Cardinal
5 Jul 180772.3DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Diego Gregorio Cadello
Diego Gregorio Cardinal Cadello (born , died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
  • a cardinal for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,509
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 25
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Jan 1803

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016