Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Maria Bua

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1773BornOschieri
4 Jun 179723.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Jun 179723.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 182754.3SelectedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
28 Jan 182854.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
15 Jun 182854.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
24 Oct 184067.2DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Bua:
Archbishop Giovanni Maria Bua (born , died ) Archbishop of Oristano

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013