Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Nepomuceno Ferdiani

Deceased

Bishop of Iglesias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1756³BornCagliari
30 Jun 181962.7SelectedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
23 Aug 181962.8ConfirmedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
21 Dec 181963.1Ordained BishopBishop of Iglesias, Italy
19 Jan 184184.2DiedBishop of Iglesias, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Nepomuceno Ferdiani:
Bishop Giovanni Nepomuceno Ferdiani (born , died ) Bishop of Iglesias

  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013