Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serafino Carchero, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1763BornCuglieri
15 Dec 178017.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
23 Sep 178623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Sep 182461.0SelectedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
20 Dec 182461.2ConfirmedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
1825¹61.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
8 Jan 183470.3SelectedBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy
20 Jan 183470.3ConfirmedBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy
31 Mar 184783.5DiedBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Serafino Carchero:
Bishop Serafino Carchero O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri)

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 111, and Page 289

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013