Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Gaspard Mudiso Mund’la, S.V.D.

Bishop Emeritus of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1940 Born
8 Dec 196827.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
13 Dec 199756.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Apr 199857.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Jun 199958.4SucceededBishop of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
31 Mar 201877.2RetiredBishop of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Jean-Gaspard Mudiso Mund’la (VIAF: 32591270)
Bishop Jean-Gaspard Mudiso Mund’la S.V.D. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kenge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKenge, Prefecture Apostolic of Kenge
Ordained BishopOpen Air, In Front of, Cathedral, Kenge, Diocese of Kenge

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kenge.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,268
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 31 Mar 2018