Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yves Maria Monot, C.S.Sp.

Bishop of Ouesso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1944 BornPont-l’Abbé, France
8 Sep 196319.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
197227.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
9 Jul 197228.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
22 Apr 200661.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ouesso, Congo
14 Jun 200864.0AppointedBishop of Ouesso, Congo
7 Sep 200864.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ouesso, Congo

MicroData Summary for Yves Maria Monot:
Bishop Yves Maria Monot C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop of Ouesso

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ouesso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,956

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013