Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Mmole

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mtwara, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1939Born
14 Oct 197132.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ndanda, Tanzania
12 Mar 198849.1AppointedBishop of Mtwara, Tanzania
25 May 198849.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mtwara, Tanzania
15 Oct 201576.7RetiredBishop of Mtwara, Tanzania
15 May 201980.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Mtwara, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Mmole
Bishop Gabriel Mmole (born 1939, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mtwara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNangoo
Ordained BishopMtwara, Diocese of Mtwara

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,557
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2015
  • d: CB, 15 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast