Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Martínez Sacristán

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1946Born
20 May 197124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
15 Dec 200659.9AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
4 Feb 200760.1Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
20 Sep 201972.7DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Martínez Sacristán
Bishop Gregorio Martínez Sacristán (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalvanés
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zamora, Diocese of Zamora
Death PlaceBishop’s Residence, Zamora, Diocese of Zamora
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Zamora, Diocese of Zamora

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,334
  • d: CB, 20 Sep 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast