Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Philippe André Yves Marsset

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Paris, France

Titular Bishop of Thibica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1957 Born
4 Oct 198730.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
25 Jun 198830.7Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
18 May 201961.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
18 May 201961.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibica
6 Sep 201961.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibica

MicroData Summary for Philippe André Yves Marsset
Father Philippe André Yves Marsset (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
Ordained DeaconNotre-Dame de la Croix de Ménilmontant, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame de Paris, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Paris.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 May 2019
  • c1/ob: CB, 18 May 2019
  • od/c0: AJ, 20 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 May 2019

Quantcast