Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Odilón Martínez García

Bishop of Atlacomulco, México, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1949 Born
29 Jun 197425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Toluca, México, México
30 Apr 201061.0AppointedBishop of Atlacomulco, México, México
28 Jul 201061.2Ordained BishopBishop of Atlacomulco, México, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Odilón Martínez García
Bishop Juan Odilón Martínez García (born ) Bishop of Atlacomulco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Ana, Tenancingo
Ordained BishopMajor, Seminary, Atlacomulco, Diocese of Atlacomulco, México

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Atlacomulco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,765

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast