Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mosè Marcia

Bishop Emeritus of Nuoro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1943 Born
17 Jul 197329.7Ordained PriestPriest of Cagliari, Italy
3 Jun 200662.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cagliari, Italy
3 Jun 200662.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vardimissa
8 Sep 200662.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vardimissa
21 Apr 201167.5AppointedBishop of Nuoro, Italy
19 Jun 201167.6InstalledBishop of Nuoro, Italy
2 Jul 201975.7RetiredBishop of Nuoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mosè Marcia
Bishop Mosè Marcia (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nuoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Sperate
Ordained BishopNostra Signora di Bonaria, Basilica, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nuoro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2006
  • ob: CB
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,238
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2011
  • i: CB, 29 May 2011
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast