Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Cogoni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Iglesias, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1916Born
29 Jun 194024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cagliari, Italy
7 Sep 197054.2AppointedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
18 Oct 197054.3Ordained BishopBishop of Iglesias, Italy
25 Mar 199275.7RetiredBishop of Iglesias, Italy
12 Sep 200791.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Iglesias, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Cogoni
Bishop Giovanni Cogoni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Iglesias

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuartu Sant'Elena

  • a priest for 67.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Apr 2017