Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José María Martínez y Cabañas

Deceased

Archbishop of Tegucigalpa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1841BornJuticalpa
29 Jan 187129.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 190260.3AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
20 Jul 190260.7Ordained BishopBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
2 Feb 191674.2AppointedArchbishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras
11 Aug 192179.7DiedArchbishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras

MicroData Summary for José María Martínez y Cabañas:
Archbishop José María Martínez y Cabañas (born , died ) Archbishop of Tegucigalpa

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 218
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,032
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013