Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Germanico Malaspina

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1550¹BornParma
5 Sep 158030.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gratz
27 Apr 158333.3AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
25 Aug 158333.6Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
20 Oct 158434.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
18 Jan 158636.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
3 Mar 159141.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
6 Jun 159242.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
21 Dec 159242.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
1597¹47.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
9 Oct 160353.7DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Germanico Malaspina (VIAF: 197880946)
Bishop Germanico Malaspina (born 1550, died ) Bishop of San Severo

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 168
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,538
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 272

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Oct 2016