Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriele de Alexandris, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gallese, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Apr 1566AppointedBishop of Gallese, Italy
5 May 1566Ordained BishopBishop of Gallese, Italy
16 Sep 1569ResignedBishop of Gallese, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gabriele de Alexandris
Bishop Gabriele de Alexandris O.P. , Bishop Emeritus of Gallese

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo
Ordained BishopSanta Sabina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 200
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast