Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio Esteban Larrondo Yez

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

Titular Bishop of Magarmel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1959 Born
2 May 199232.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Chile
12 Dec 199233.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
26 May 202060.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
26 May 202060.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Magarmel
26 Sep 202061.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magarmel

MicroData Summary for Julio Esteban Larrondo Yez
Bishop Julio Esteban Larrondo Yez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained PriestSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopOutdoors, Cerro San Cristbal, Inmaculada Concepcin, Shrine, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 May 2020
  • od/c1: CB, 26 May 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast