Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond-Marie-Turiaf de La Porte

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans

Titular Bishop of Berissa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1857BornVersailles
17 Dec 188124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
12 Aug 191254.9AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
9 Oct 191255.1Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
30 Nov 191760.2ResignedBishop of Le Mans, France
30 Nov 191760.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Berissa
9 Jun 192668.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Raymond-Marie-Turiaf de La Porte:
Bishop Raymond-Marie-Turiaf de La Porte (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 66
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013