Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustine Kim Jae Deok

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1920BornChien-An
28 Oct 194727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}, Korea (South)
29 Jan 197352.6AppointedBishop of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}, Korea (South)
19 Mar 197352.7Ordained BishopBishop of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}, Korea (South)
10 Apr 198160.8ResignedBishop of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}, Korea (South)
5 Jun 198868.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Augustine Kim Jae Deok:
Bishop Augustine Kim Jae Deok (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015