Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartholomew Kim Kyon Pae

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Chonju

Titular Bishop of Agbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1906BornYesan
21 May 193225.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 194740.8AppointedPrefect of Zenshu, Korea (South)
12 Jul 195043.9AppointedPrefect of Chonju, Korea (South)
26 Jan 195750.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Agbia
26 Jan 195750.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chonju, Korea (South)
21 May 195750.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agbia
30 Apr 196053.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Chonju, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Bartholomew Kim Kyon Pae:
Bishop Bartholomew Kim Kyon Pae (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Chonju

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013