Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Jiménez de Samaniego, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621²Born
24 May 168362.3AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
15 Aug 168362.6Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
14 Jun 169271.4DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Jiménez de Samaniego
Bishop José Jiménez de Samaniego O.F.M. (born 1621, died ) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNájera
Ordained BishopS. Domingo de la Calzada

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 224, Number 1,389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 17
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Number 4,747

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast