Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Hwang Chul-soo

Bishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1953 Born
5 Feb 198329.8Ordained PriestPriest of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)
17 Jan 200652.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)
17 Jan 200652.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Pacati
24 Feb 200652.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicus Pacati
21 Nov 200754.5AppointedBishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Paul Hwang Chul-soo
Bishop Paul Hwang Chul-soo (born ) Bishop of Busan {Pusan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiryang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Busan {Pusan}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,070
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018