Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Ahn Myong-ok

Bishop of Masan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1945 BornMasan
2 Feb 197529.2Ordained PriestPriest of Masan, Korea (South)
23 Oct 200054.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Masan, Korea (South)
8 Jan 200155.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Masan, Korea (South)
11 Nov 200256.9SucceededBishop of Masan, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Ahn Myong-ok:
Bishop Francis Xavier Ahn Myong-ok (born ) Bishop of Masan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Masan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,881
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013