Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeffrey Robert Haines

Auxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

Titular Bishop of Thagamuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1958 Born
17 May 198526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
25 Jan 201758.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
25 Jan 201758.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagamuta
17 Mar 201758.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagamuta

MicroData Summary for Jeffrey Robert Haines
Bishop Jeffrey Robert Haines (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilwaukee, Archdiocese of Milwaukee, Wisconsin
Ordained BishopSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Milwaukee, Archdiocese of Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Milwaukee.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2017
  • c12: Website of the Diocese, 25 Jan 2017
  • ob: CB, 1 Feb 2017
  • c34: CB, 5 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Mar 2017