Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Gravelli

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic

Titular Archbishop of Suas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1922BornCittą S. Angelo
29 Oct 194422.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Dec 196745.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Suas
24 Dec 196745.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
21 Jan 196845.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Suas
12 Jul 197351.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic
11 Dec 198159.7DiedApostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Gravelli:
Archbishop Giovanni Gravelli (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Dominican Republic

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013