Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amadeu González Ferreiros, O. de M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui

Titular Bishop of Metrae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1911BornSindrán-Monforte, Spain
22 Dec 193423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
23 Dec 196150.4AppointedPrelate of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil
18 Feb 196351.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Metrae
19 May 196351.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metrae
28 Dec 196756.4ResignedPrelate of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil
20 Mar 199583.7DiedPrelate Emeritus of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Amadeu González Ferreiros:
Bishop Amadeu González Ferreiros O. de M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of São Raimundo Nonato

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013