Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Giannini

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}

Titular Bishop of Subaugusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1923BornNettuno
15 Jun 194623.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 198057.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
1 Dec 198057.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Subaugusta
6 Jan 198157.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Subaugusta
3 Jul 199875.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
10 Feb 201288.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Giannini:
Bishop Filippo Giannini (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014