Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Francis Garner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey

Titular Bishop of Blera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1920BornJersey City
15 Jun 194626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
3 May 197656.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
3 May 197656.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Blera
25 Jun 197656.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Blera
11 Jun 199575.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
25 Dec 200080.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Francis Garner:
Bishop Robert Francis Garner (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013