Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge García Isaza, C.M.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tierradentro

Titular Bishop of Budua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1928 BornManizales
14 Feb 195425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
5 May 198960.8AppointedPrefect of Tierradentro, Colombia
17 Feb 200071.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Budua
17 Feb 200071.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tierradentro, Colombia
26 Mar 200071.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Budua
25 Apr 200374.8RetiredVicar Apostolic of Tierradentro, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jorge García Isaza:
Bishop Jorge García Isaza C.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tierradentro

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Tierradentro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,729

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013