Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Franzi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Novara, Italy

Titular Bishop of Cittą Ducale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1910Born
17 Dec 193222.4Ordained PriestPriest of Novara, Italy
5 Mar 197362.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Novara, Italy
5 Mar 197362.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cittą Ducale
15 Apr 197362.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cittą Ducale
1 Mar 199180.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Novara, Italy
10 Dec 199686.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Franzi
Bishop Francesco Maria Franzi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVaprio d'Agogna
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Assunta, Cathedral, Novara, Diocese of Novara

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,691

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast