Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwig Forwerk

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony)

Titular Bishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia

Administrator of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1816BornDresden
18 Nov 183923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
11 Jul 185437.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany
11 Jul 185437.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia
24 Sep 185438.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia
26 Jan 185538.4AppointedAdministrator of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
8 Jan 187558.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany

MicroData Summary for Ludwig Forwerk
Bishop Ludwig Forwerk (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony)

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 338
  • b: CB, 12 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Oct 2016