Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jakob Beer, O.Cr. †

Deceased

Grand Master of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1796Born
17 Feb 182024.0ProfessedMember of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star
25 Mar 182024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star
1840²43.8AppointedGrand Master of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star
13 Jun 186670.3DiedGrand Master of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jakob Beer (VIAF: 310509080)
Father Jakob Beer O.Cr. (born , died ) Grand Master of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKuttenplan

  • a priest for 46.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 27 Jun 2020

Quantcast