Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Mario Espósito Castro, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zárate-Campana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1927BornNapoli
1 Aug 195427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
21 Apr 197648.9AppointedBishop of Zárate-Campana, Argentina
4 Jul 197649.1Ordained BishopBishop of Zárate-Campana, Argentina
18 Dec 199164.6ResignedBishop of Zárate-Campana, Argentina
1 Jan 201082.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Zárate-Campana, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Mario Espósito Castro:
Bishop Alfredo Mario Espósito Castro C.M.F. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zárate-Campana

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013