Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Francisco Escobar Galicia

Bishop of Teotihuacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1955 BornOtumba
13 Aug 198328.3Ordained PriestPriest of Texcoco, México, México
3 Dec 200853.6AppointedBishop of Teotihuacán, México, México
24 Feb 200953.8Ordained BishopBishop of Teotihuacán, México, México

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Francisco Escobar Galicia:
Bishop Guillermo Francisco Escobar Galicia (born ) Bishop of Teotihuacán

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Teotihuacán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,056

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015